Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Satisfaction of a Mortgage – Required Homeowner’s Insurance (Cassidy’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an owner of residential real property in the State that is not subject to a mortgage to maintain homeowner's insurance coverage on the property with liability coverage of at least $100,000 for bodily or personal injury occurring on the property.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2021
Legislative Date
2/21/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2021 2/21/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Real Property – Satisfaction of a Mortgage – Required Homeowner’s Insurance (Cassidy’s Law)
Senate 3/23/2021 3/24/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
(   14-133 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page