Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Cassilly, Norman, Peters, and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Victim Services Unit in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; transferring existing functions and operations of the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board and the sexual assault forensic examinations program to the Unit; requiring the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board to maintain an office in Baltimore City to accept and provide assistance in processing claims; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report on matters related to crime victims by December 31, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0247
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {598572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {203820/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {572817/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez and McComas)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez and McComas)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Lee and Kelley)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {598572/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {203820/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Judiciary 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {572817/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Refuses Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez and McComas) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez and McComas) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Lee and Kelley) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-1007, 11-1101 through 11-1105, 11-801, 11-803, 11-804, 11-805, 11-814, 11-815, 11-816.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page