Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Curriculum Standards - Antihate and Holocaust Education (Educate to Stop the Hate Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Brooks, Feldman, Gile, Hettleman, Jackson, Lam, Lewis Young, Salling, Smith, Waldstreicher, West, Zucker, and Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring county boards of education to establish curriculum guides and courses of study that are aligned with certain content standards developed by the State Department of Education, and requiring the State Board of Education to withhold certain funds from county boards that fail to do so; establishing certain requirements for the Department's process for developing, reviewing, and adopting certain content standards, curriculum standards, and curriculum resources; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1181
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Education - Curriculum Standards - Antihate and Holocaust Education (Educate to Stop the Hate Act)
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {253425/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Curriculum Standards - Antihate and Holocaust Education (Educate to Stop the Hate Act)
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Ways and Means 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
(   7-135 )
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 11:25 AM
Click to return on the top page