Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pinsky, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Family Planning Program in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to ensure the continuity of family planning services in the State; requiring the Program to provide family planning services to specified individuals through specified providers; authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to ensure access to and continuity of services provided by specified family planning providers in a specified manner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {449739/1
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {449739/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {449739/1 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {449739/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-51) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810
Text - Chapter - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
(   13-3401, 13-3402, 15-101, 15-102.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page