Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of Process
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly and Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain requirements for service of process by a landlord of nonresidential property in an action for repossession for nonpayment of rent by requiring service to be directed to the sheriff for the appropriate county or municipality and authorizing service, on plaintiff's request, to be directed to any person authorized under the Maryland Rules to serve process.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1329
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of Process
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of Process
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text - Chapter - Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of Process
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page