Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Douglas J. J. Peters Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship - Repeal of Service Terminal Date
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Brooks, Carozza, Carter, Charles, Corderman, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Folden, Gallion, Gile, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Hester, Hettleman, Jackson, James, Jennings, Kagan, Kelly, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lewis Young, Mautz, McCray, McKay, Muse, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Watson, West, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the service terminal date required to be eligible for the Douglas J. J. Peters Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Higher Education - Douglas J. J. Peters Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship - Repeal of Service Terminal Date
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/09/2024 3/09/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Douglas J. J. Peters Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship - Repeal of Service Terminal Date
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Appropriations 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page