Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Upgraded Wastewater Facilities - Grants to Counties and Municipalities
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to use funds from the Bay Restoration Fund to provide grants to a county or municipality that upgraded a wastewater facility to enhanced nutrient removal before July 1, 2013, under specified circumstances; and specifying that the Department may award up to $2,000,000 in grants on a first-come, first-served basis.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Senate Rules 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Upgraded Municipal Wastewater Facilities - Grants
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {194537/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Upgraded Wastewater Facilities - Grants to Counties and Municipalities
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text - Chapter -
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page