Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Abortion -see also- Reproductive Matters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Public Health – Abortion, Artificial Insemination, and Sterilization – Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Prenatal Diagnosis of Down Syndrome (Down Syndrome Dignity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 (SB0669)
Title
Pregnant Person's Freedom Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735
Title
Public Health – Abortion
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937 /CH0056 (SB0890)
Title
Abortion Care Access Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Access to Abortion Care and Health Insurance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161
Title
Health - Abortion - Ultrasound and Waiting Period
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Coercion (Coercive Abuse Against Mothers Prevention Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Maryland Child Protection Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230
Title
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317
Title
Health - Informed Consent (Woman's Right to Know Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Standards and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504
Title
Equal Protection of Unborn Human Beings Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535
Title
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0626)
Title
Pregnant Person's Freedom Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 (HB0937/CH0056)
Title
Abortion Care Access Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Public Health - Medical Procedures - Parent or Guardian Notice (Maryland Parental Involvement Enhancement Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 Public Health – Abortion, Artificial Insemination, and Sterilization – Requirement Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0583 Public Health - Abortions - Prenatal Diagnosis of Down Syndrome (Down Syndrome Dignity Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0626 (SB0669) Pregnant Person's Freedom Act of 2022 Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 Public Health – Abortion Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0937 /CH0056 (SB0890) Abortion Care Access Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 56
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0952 Access to Abortion Care and Health Insurance Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act) Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 Health - Abortion - Ultrasound and Waiting Period Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1167 Public Health - Abortions - Coercion (Coercive Abuse Against Mothers Prevention Act) Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty Delegate Jones, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1214 Maryland Child Protection Act of 2022 Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1230 Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2022 Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1317 Health - Informed Consent (Woman's Right to Know Act) Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1321 Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirement Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1369 Public Health - Abortions - Standards and Reporting Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0504 Equal Protection of Unborn Human Beings Act of 2022 Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0535 Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 (HB0626) Pregnant Person's Freedom Act of 2022 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0890 (HB0937/CH0056) Abortion Care Access Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
SB0891 Public Health - Medical Procedures - Parent or Guardian Notice (Maryland Parental Involvement Enhancement Act) Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page