Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0143)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 (SB0161)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0143 (HB0018)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 (HB0079)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199
Title
State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0143) Maryland Paint Stewardship Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0079 (SB0161) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0143 (HB0018) Maryland Paint Stewardship Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 (HB0079) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 6:33 PM
Click to return on the top page