Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Biometrics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023 (SB0234)
Title
Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0016)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0571)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 (HB0218)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0023)
Title
Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0736)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587
Title
Task Force on Facial Recognition Privacy Protection
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 (SB0234) Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
1/27/2021 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0218 (SB0016) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0736 (SB0571) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact Speaker 3 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0016 (HB0218) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0234 (HB0023) Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0571 (HB0736) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact President 3 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0587 Task Force on Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0930 Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page