Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Biometrics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0335)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 (SB0766)
Title
Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962 (SB0643)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Biometric Authentication Requirements for Governmental Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0259)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0962)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB0866)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Genetic Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0259 (SB0335) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0866 (SB0766) Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0962 (SB0643) Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1463 Biometric Authentication Requirements for Governmental Services - Prohibition Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0011 Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0259) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 (HB0962) Commercial Law - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0766 (HB0866) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Genetic Information Privacy Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:14 AM
Click to return on the top page