Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Commission on Civil Rights

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0385 (SB0220/CH0386)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 /CH0219 (SB0236/CH0220)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 /CH0201 (SB0455/CH0202)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0386 (HB0128/CH0385)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0220 (HB0257/CH0219)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 /CH0202 (HB0290/CH0201)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 /CH0385 (SB0220/CH0386) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0257 /CH0219 (SB0236/CH0220) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0290 /CH0201 (SB0455/CH0202) Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Health and Government Operations
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1216 Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0220 /CH0386 (HB0128/CH0385) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0236 /CH0220 (HB0257/CH0219) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
SB0455 /CH0202 (HB0290/CH0201) Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:22 AM
Click to return on the top page