Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County Councils

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042
Title
Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354
Title
Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0611
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 /CH0569
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 /CH0602 (HB0585/CH0601)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 /CH0368
Title
Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0354 Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0397 /CH0611 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 /CH0569 Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0432 /CH0602 (HB0585/CH0601) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0908 Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0952 /CH0368 Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 4:33 PM
Click to return on the top page