Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 6/13/2024 10:38:45 PM
Thursday, June 13, 2024
Thursday, June 13, 2024
Other
Maryland Economic Development Commission
Change made: June 13, 2024 4:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Economic Development Commission - Other
June 27, 2024 3:00 PM
Prince Georges County Chamber of Commerce, Suite 130, 4640 Forbes Blvd., Lanham,MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce and Strategic Plan Process.

Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Change made: June 13, 2024 8:42 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Prescription Drug Affordability Board - Other
July 22, 2024 2:00 PM to July 22, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: Zoom / YouTube)
July Meeting of the Maryland Prescription Drug Affordability Board.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: June 13, 2024 4:47 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
July 11, 2024 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business and the Notice of Funding Availability for the School Safety Grant Program.

Click to return on the top page