Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Elections Supervisors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099
Title
Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Requirements and Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0113
Title
Elections - In-Person Voting - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Elections – Voter Registry – Notification and Removal of Deceased Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 (SB0284)
Title
Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212
Title
Election Law - Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 (SB0101)
Title
Election Law - Contested Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0327
Title
Elections - Election Judges - Minimum Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347
Title
Baltimore County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702
Title
Election Judges - Training and Signs - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0745 (SB0742)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Elections – Absentee Ballots – Mailing of Unrequested Ballots
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963
Title
Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Verification and Verification Statements and Unsigned Ballot Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119
Title
Election Law – Polling Places and Early Voting Centers – Aerial Pictures of Electioneering Boundary
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348
Title
Election Law - Manual Postelection Tabulation Audit - Timing and Selection
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Election Law – Curbside Voting – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 (SB0956)
Title
Criminal Law – Threats to Public Officials
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 (HB0291)
Title
Election Law - Contested Elections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 (HB0201)
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration Drive - High Schools
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532
Title
Election Law – Polling Places – Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738
Title
Secure Elections Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 (HB0745)
Title
Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audits – Risk–Limiting Audits
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB1409)
Title
Criminal Law - Threats to Public Officials
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Requirements and Verification Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0113 Elections - In-Person Voting - Proof of Identity Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0169 Elections – Voter Registry – Notification and Removal of Deceased Individuals Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0201 (SB0284) Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0212 Election Law - Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0291 (SB0101) Election Law - Contested Elections Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0327 Elections - Election Judges - Minimum Compensation Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0329 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 Baltimore County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0619 Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 Election Judges - Training and Signs - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0745 (SB0742) Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0939 Elections – Absentee Ballots – Mailing of Unrequested Ballots Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0963 Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Verification and Verification Statements and Unsigned Ballot Statements Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1119 Election Law – Polling Places and Early Voting Centers – Aerial Pictures of Electioneering Boundary Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1348 Election Law - Manual Postelection Tabulation Audit - Timing and Selection Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 Election Law – Curbside Voting – Establishment Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 (SB0956) Criminal Law – Threats to Public Officials Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0101 (HB0291) Election Law - Contested Elections Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0163 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 (HB0201) Election Law - Voter Registration Drive - High Schools Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0352 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0532 Election Law – Polling Places – Proof of Identity Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0738 Secure Elections Act of 2022 Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 (HB0745) Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audits – Risk–Limiting Audits Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0956 (HB1409) Criminal Law - Threats to Public Officials Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2022 10:47 AM
Click to return on the top page