Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Franchise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 /CH0423 (SB0562)
Title
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 (SB0002)
Title
Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723
Title
Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 (HB0676)
Title
Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0473/CH0423)
Title
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0473 /CH0423 (SB0562) Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0676 (SB0002) Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0723 Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - Repeal Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 (HB0676) Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0473/CH0423) Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities Senator Peters 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page