Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/19/2021 10:12:20 PM
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 10/6/2021 12:31 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting with Dr. Arlotto, Superintendent of Anne Arundel County Schools.

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Created: 9/24/2021 4:51 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Audit: Maryland Higher Education Commission (June 2021)
(Added - 9/29/2021 2:32 PM)

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/18/2021 8:51 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals-FAQ Call
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 944 4552 5281 Passcode: 228453
Dial-in Number: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 944 4552 5281 Passcode: 228453
Meeting to discuss the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission release of the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority
Created: 10/13/2021 11:06 AM
9:00 AM - TEDCO, 7021 Columbia Gateway Dr., #200, Columbia, MD
Conference Call-In Number: (US) 1-515-822-0263 PIN: 139 767 285#
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting

State Park Investment Commission
Created: 10/12/2021 12:09 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Department of Legislative Services and National invited speakers' presentations.

Click to return on the top page