Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Hearing Aids

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0711 (SB0523/CH0712)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Health Insurance – Hearing Aids for Adults – Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 /CH0712 (HB0600/CH0711)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
Sponsor
Senator Lam
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0600 /CH0711 (SB0523/CH0712) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees Delegate Belcastro 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0910 Health Insurance – Hearing Aids for Adults – Coverage Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0523 /CH0712 (HB0600/CH0711) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees Senator Lam 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page