Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Hearing Aids

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0400 (SB0103/CH0399)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Physician Members - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0399 (HB0155/CH0400)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0155 /CH0400 (SB0103/CH0399) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2022 - 4:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0830 State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Physician Members - Repeal Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0103 /CH0399 (HB0155/CH0400) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page