Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Judicial Review -see also- Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0979)
Title
Local Government - Accommodations Intermediaries - Hotel Rental Tax Collection by Comptroller
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Qualifying Municipal Corporation - Land Use MC/PG 114-25
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266
Title
Task Force to Study Land Use Issues in Prince George's County - Establishment MC/PG 117-25
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979 (HB1103)
Title
Local Government - Accommodations Intermediaries - Hotel Rental Tax - Collection by Comptroller and Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0303 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 (SB0979) Local Government - Accommodations Intermediaries - Hotel Rental Tax Collection by Comptroller Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1231 Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Qualifying Municipal Corporation - Land Use MC/PG 114-25 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1266 Task Force to Study Land Use Issues in Prince George's County - Establishment MC/PG 117-25 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 3:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/01/2025 - 3:30 PM
SB0979 (HB1103) Local Government - Accommodations Intermediaries - Hotel Rental Tax - Collection by Comptroller and Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2025 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page