Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mobile Devices -see also- Telecommunications and IT

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0148 (SB0328/CH0149)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194
Title
Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629
Title
Election Law - Polling Places and Early Voting Centers - Electronic Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0469
Title
Child Care Programs – Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program – Information and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769 /CH0164 (SB0325/CH0163)
Title
Student Data Privacy - Protections, Digital Tools, and Student Data Privacy Council
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 (SB0517)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Location Information - Exigent Circumstances (Kelsey Smith Act for Maryland)
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB0840)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Election Law – Curbside Voting – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0163 (HB0769/CH0164)
Title
Student Data Privacy - Protections, Digital Tools, and Student Data Privacy Council
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 /CH0149 (HB0148/CH0148)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 (HB1053)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Location Information (Kelsey Smith Act for Maryland)
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839
Title
Maryland Voluntary COVID-19 Vaccine Passport
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1084)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0148 /CH0148 (SB0328/CH0149) Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0194 Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0629 Election Law - Polling Places and Early Voting Centers - Electronic Devices Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 /CH0469 Child Care Programs – Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program – Information and Assistance Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 /CH0164 (SB0325/CH0163) Student Data Privacy - Protections, Digital Tools, and Student Data Privacy Council Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0846 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 (SB0517) Criminal Procedure - Location Information - Exigent Circumstances (Kelsey Smith Act for Maryland) Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1084 (SB0840) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1404 Election Law – Curbside Voting – Establishment Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 /CH0163 (HB0769/CH0164) Student Data Privacy - Protections, Digital Tools, and Student Data Privacy Council Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 /CH0149 (HB0148/CH0148) Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0517 (HB1053) Criminal Procedure - Location Information (Kelsey Smith Act for Maryland) Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0839 Maryland Voluntary COVID-19 Vaccine Passport Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 (HB1084) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page