Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Names

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 (SB0078)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 /CH0072 (SB0654/CH0073)
Title
Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 (SB0377)
Title
Marriage Records – Name Change
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0183 (SB0560/CH0184)
Title
Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 (SB0311)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034 (SB0720)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Public High Schools - Student Athletes - Compensation for Name, Image, and Likeness
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1433 /CH0160
Title
State Highways – Designations – Piscataway Highway
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0072)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0790)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB0369)
Title
Marriage Records - Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Consumer Protection – Consumer Electronic Equipment – Right to Repair
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0654 /CH0073 (HB0279/CH0072)
Title
Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720 (HB1034)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 (SB0078) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0271 Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0279 /CH0072 (SB0654/CH0073) Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0369 (SB0377) Marriage Records – Name Change Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0385 /CH0183 (SB0560/CH0184) Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements Delegate Lehman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0565 Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0638 State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 (SB0311) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1034 (SB0720) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1431 Public High Schools - Student Athletes - Compensation for Name, Image, and Likeness Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1433 /CH0160 State Highways – Designations – Piscataway Highway Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 (HB0072) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0311 (HB0790) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0377 (HB0369) Marriage Records - Name Change Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-27)
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0631 Consumer Protection – Consumer Electronic Equipment – Right to Repair Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0654 /CH0073 (HB0279/CH0072) Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0720 (HB1034) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:20 AM
Click to return on the top page