Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Names

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141 (SB0251)
Title
State Government – Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0140)
Title
State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge - Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361
Title
Certificates of Birth - Issuance of New Certificates - Sex Designation (Birth Certificate Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-Stadium (Baseball Stadium) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 306-23
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 (SB0516)
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0686
Title
Financial Regulation - Modernizing Licensing of Non-Depository Institutions and Elimination of Branch License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0892)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Insurance Identification Card – Multiple Named Insureds
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981
Title
Limited Liability Companies - Articles of Organization - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090
Title
Public High Schools - Student Athletes - Compensation for Name, Image, and Likeness
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
Development Transparency Act of 2023
Sponsor
Delegate Wu
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 (HB0311)
Title
State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 (HB0141)
Title
State Government - Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293
Title
Corrections - Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479
Title
Department of Small, Minority, and Women Business Enterprises - Establishment and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 (HB0556)
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561
Title
Goodwill Industries of Chesapeake Excel Center in Baltimore City - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB0721)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Multiple Named Insureds
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0141 (SB0251) State Government – Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs – Alterations Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0311 (SB0140) State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge - Designation Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 Certificates of Birth - Issuance of New Certificates - Sex Designation (Birth Certificate Modernization Act) Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0438 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-Stadium (Baseball Stadium) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 306-23 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0446 Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0556 (SB0516) Cannabis Reform Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
2/17/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0686 Financial Regulation - Modernizing Licensing of Non-Depository Institutions and Elimination of Branch License Requirements Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 (SB0892) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Insurance Identification Card – Multiple Named Insureds Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 Limited Liability Companies - Articles of Organization - Required Information Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 Public High Schools - Student Athletes - Compensation for Name, Image, and Likeness Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1195 Development Transparency Act of 2023 Delegate Wu 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0140 (HB0311) State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Finance
2/01/2023 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0251 (HB0141) State Government - Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs - Alterations Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2023 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 Corrections - Incarcerated Individuals Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 Department of Small, Minority, and Women Business Enterprises - Establishment and Duties Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 (HB0556) Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0561 Goodwill Industries of Chesapeake Excel Center in Baltimore City - Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0862 Consumer Protection - Security Questions and Measures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB0721) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Multiple Named Insureds Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/26/2023 7:01 PM
Click to return on the top page