Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Nudity and Sexual Displays -see also- Obscenity; Pornography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0393
Title
Juveniles - Sexting
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382
Title
Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure With Lascivious or Prurient Intent
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0331
Title
Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0180 /CH0393 Juveniles - Sexting Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 393
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0382 Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1001 Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure With Lascivious or Prurient Intent Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0270 /CH0331 Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page