Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 /CH0235 (SB0808)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0557)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 (SB0694/CH0193)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002
Title
Natural Resources - County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1005
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fisheries Offenses - Stay of Revocation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0696)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Vessels
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0760)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 /CH0193 (HB0815)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB1036)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0287/CH0235)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931
Title
Oysters - Oyster Committees and Harvest Reserve Areas
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0287 /CH0235 (SB0808) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 (SB0557) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 (SB0694/CH0193) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1002 Natural Resources - County Oyster Committees Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1005 Natural Resources - Commercial Fisheries Offenses - Stay of Revocation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 (SB0696) Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1274 Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Vessels Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0557 (HB0760) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0694 /CH0193 (HB0815) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0696 (HB1036) Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 (HB0287/CH0235) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 Oysters - Oyster Committees and Harvest Reserve Areas Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page