Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145
Title
Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 (SB0324)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800
Title
Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001 (SJ0004)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 (HB0204)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0001)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0204 (SB0324) Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0800 Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HJ0001 (SJ0004) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
Rules
SB0324 (HB0204) Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0350 Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SJ0004 (HJ0001) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/06/2021 - 9:45 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:17 PM
Click to return on the top page