Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
Dredging on Man–O–War Shoals – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Oyster Shell Dredging - Permit Application
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Oysters – Tributary–Scale Sanctuaries
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201 /CH0412 (SB0876/CH0411)
Title
Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830/CH0574)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580
Title
Sewer Systems and Wastewater Treatment Plants - Water Pollution - Shellfish Harvester Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 /CH0574 (HB1228/CH0030)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 /CH0411 (HB1201/CH0412)
Title
Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902
Title
Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979
Title
Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0500 Dredging on Man–O–War Shoals – Prohibition Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 Department of Natural Resources - Oyster Shell Dredging - Permit Application Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1133 Oysters – Tributary–Scale Sanctuaries Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 /CH0412 (SB0876/CH0411) Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830/CH0574) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1310 Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0580 Sewer Systems and Wastewater Treatment Plants - Water Pollution - Shellfish Harvester Restitution Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 /CH0574 (HB1228/CH0030) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0876 /CH0411 (HB1201/CH0412) Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0902 Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page