Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pharmacy Benefits Managers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 (SB0689)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973 /CH0307 (SB0823/CH0308)
Title
Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Network Adequacy, Credentialing, and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers and Purchasers - Beneficiary Choice of Pharmacy
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014 (SB0690)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibitions Related to Reimbursement and Use of Specific Pharmacy Requirement - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 /CH0365
Title
Prescription Drugs - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Federal 340B Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397 /CH0405 (SB0353)
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance (Insulin Cost Reduction Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353 (HB1397/CH0405)
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance (Insulin Cost Reduction Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB0755)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690 (HB1014)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 /CH0308 (HB0973/CH0307)
Title
Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations and Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Amounts
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0755 (SB0689) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0973 /CH0307 (SB0823/CH0308) Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1006 Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Network Adequacy, Credentialing, and Reimbursement Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1007 Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1008 Pharmacy Benefits Managers and Purchasers - Beneficiary Choice of Pharmacy Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1009 Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1014 (SB0690) Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1015 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibitions Related to Reimbursement and Use of Specific Pharmacy Requirement - Application Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1274 /CH0365 Prescription Drugs - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Federal 340B Program Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
4/11/2022 - 2:05 PM
HB1275 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1397 /CH0405 (SB0353) Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance (Insulin Cost Reduction Act) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0353 (HB1397/CH0405) Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance (Insulin Cost Reduction Act) Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0689 (HB0755) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 (HB1014) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 /CH0308 (HB0973/CH0307) Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations and Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Contracts Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB1004 Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Amounts Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:11 PM
Click to return on the top page