Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pharmacy Benefits Managers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0626)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0497)
Title
Health Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Opioid Reversal Drugs and Products (NARCAN Price Cap Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0526)
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 (SB0595)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Calculation of Cost Sharing Contribution - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB1021)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Administration - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 /CH0847 (SB0791/CH0848)
Title
Health Insurance - Utilization Review - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB1019)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Prescription Drugs - Rebates and Calculation of Cost Sharing Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368 (SB0754)
Title
Health Insurance Carriers and Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Clinician–Administered Drugs and Related Services
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0736)
Title
Health Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Opioid Reversal Drugs and Products
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0526 (HB0876)
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs Dispensed by a Physician
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 (HB0879)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Calculation of Cost Sharing Contribution - Requirements and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0726)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1368)
Title
Health Insurance Carriers and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Clinician-Administered Drugs and Related Services
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 /CH0848 (HB0932/CH0847)
Title
Health Insurance - Utilization Review - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1019 (HB1270)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Prescription Drugs - Rebates and Calculation of Cost Sharing Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB0880)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Administration - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0726 (SB0626) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0736 (SB0497) Health Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Opioid Reversal Drugs and Products (NARCAN Price Cap Act) Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0876 (SB0526) Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0879 (SB0595) Health Benefit Plans - Calculation of Cost Sharing Contribution - Requirements Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0880 (SB1021) Pharmacy Benefits Administration - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Pharmacy Benefits Managers Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0932 /CH0847 (SB0791/CH0848) Health Insurance - Utilization Review - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 847
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1270 (SB1019) Health Benefit Plans - Prescription Drugs - Rebates and Calculation of Cost Sharing Requirements Delegate Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 (SB0754) Health Insurance Carriers and Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Clinician–Administered Drugs and Related Services Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 (HB0736) Health Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Opioid Reversal Drugs and Products Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0526 (HB0876) Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs Dispensed by a Physician Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 (HB0879) Health Benefit Plans - Calculation of Cost Sharing Contribution - Requirements and Prohibitions Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Finance
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 (HB0726) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 (HB1368) Health Insurance Carriers and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Clinician-Administered Drugs and Related Services Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 /CH0848 (HB0932/CH0847) Health Insurance - Utilization Review - Revisions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 848
Finance
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1019 (HB1270) Health Benefit Plans - Prescription Drugs - Rebates and Calculation of Cost Sharing Requirements Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1021 (HB0880) Pharmacy Benefits Administration - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Pharmacy Benefits Managers Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page