Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Physician Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0099
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 /CH0608
Title
Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0807)
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 /CH0031
Title
Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1339)
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0459 /CH0099 Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0661 /CH0608 Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates Delegate Myers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0807) Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 /CH0031 Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 (HB1339) Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page