Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Podiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 (SB1011)
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 (SB0159)
Title
Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 (SB0311)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0462)
Title
Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Financial Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0790)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority and Collaboration
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB0055)
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 (SB1011) Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 (SB0159) Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0790 (SB0311) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0159 (HB0462) Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Financial Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0311 (HB0790) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0312 Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority and Collaboration Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1011 (HB0055) Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2022 10:13 AM
Click to return on the top page