Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Police Training and Standards Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0558)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Prohibition Against Certain Affiliation or Support by Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Criminal Procedure – No–Knock Search Warrants – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Police Immunity and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
General Assembly - Use of Force - Required Training Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329
Title
Suicide Treatment Improvement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0383
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Electronic Stalking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0162)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949
Title
Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0558) Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0426 Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Prohibition Against Certain Affiliation or Support by Police Officers Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0651 Criminal Procedure – No–Knock Search Warrants – Repeal Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1012 Police Immunity and Accountability Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 General Assembly - Use of Force - Required Training Program Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2022 - 8:30 AM
HB1329 Suicide Treatment Improvement Act Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0031 Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0134 /CH0383 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Electronic Stalking Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0389 Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0558 (HB0162) Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0949 Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page