Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Postal Service

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305 /CH0648
Title
Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0287 (SB0447/CH0288)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0700 (SB0293/CH0701)
Title
Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 /CH0330
Title
Baltimore City – Homestead Property Tax Credit – Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 (SB0689)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092
Title
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures (Accessible Appeals for Educators Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054
Title
Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060
Title
Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0701 (HB0637/CH0700)
Title
Insurance - Title Insurance Producers - Annual Review
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 /CH0288 (HB0390/CH0287)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB0755)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0305 /CH0648 Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions Delegate Kerr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 648
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0390 /CH0287 (SB0447/CH0288) Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Economic Matters
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0637 /CH0700 (SB0293/CH0701) Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Economic Matters
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0642 /CH0330 Baltimore City – Homestead Property Tax Credit – Notice Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0755 (SB0689) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1092 Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures (Accessible Appeals for Educators Act) Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
SB0054 Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0293 /CH0701 (HB0637/CH0700) Insurance - Title Insurance Producers - Annual Review Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0447 /CH0288 (HB0390/CH0287) Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0689 (HB0755) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:31 PM
Click to return on the top page