Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Postal Service

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0649 (SB0300/CH0650)
Title
Baltimore City Young Readers Program and Young Readers Matching Grant Program - Alterations (Young Readers Program Act of 2023)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0312 (SB0265)
Title
6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion Day
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0370/CH0312)
Title
6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion Day
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 /CH0650 (HB0243/CH0649)
Title
Baltimore City Young Readers Program and Young Readers Matching Grant Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 /CH0143
Title
Public Safety - State Fuel Security Program
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0243 /CH0649 (SB0300/CH0650) Baltimore City Young Readers Program and Young Readers Matching Grant Program - Alterations (Young Readers Program Act of 2023) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Ways and Means
2/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0370 /CH0312 (SB0265) 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion Day Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0265 (HB0370/CH0312) 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion Day Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/03/2023 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0300 /CH0650 (HB0243/CH0649) Baltimore City Young Readers Program and Young Readers Matching Grant Program - Alterations Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0719 /CH0143 Public Safety - State Fuel Security Program Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
3/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/22/2023 11:59 AM
Click to return on the top page