Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Protests and Demonstrations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 (SB0519)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046 (SB0762)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0495)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB1046)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007
Title
Support of Parents’ Rights to Bring Grievances to County Boards of Education
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0495 (SB0519) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1046 (SB0762) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 (HB0495) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0762 (HB1046) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SJ0007 Support of Parents’ Rights to Bring Grievances to County Boards of Education Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/14/2022 8:30 PM
Click to return on the top page