Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 (SB0104)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Not Subject to Inspection – Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883
Title
Washington County - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Fees - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Vehicle Laws - Lighting - Privately Owned Vehicles of Volunteer Fire Company Members
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079 (SB0922)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Standards, Requirements, and Application
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150 /CH0204 (SB0579)
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Motor Vehicles - Modified Vehicle Exhaust System - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB0428)
Title
Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 (HB0046)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Not Subject to Inspection - Fee
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 /CH0232
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB1460)
Title
Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546
Title
Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 (HB1150/CH0204)
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701
Title
Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Materials - Private Detectives
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB1079)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Standards, Requirements, and Application
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0046 (SB0104) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Not Subject to Inspection – Fee Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0883 Washington County - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Fees - Distribution Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1066 Vehicle Laws - Lighting - Privately Owned Vehicles of Volunteer Fire Company Members Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 (SB0922) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Standards, Requirements, and Application Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1150 /CH0204 (SB0579) Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1333 Motor Vehicles - Modified Vehicle Exhaust System - Penalties Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1460 (SB0428) Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration Delegate Watson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0104 (HB0046) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Not Subject to Inspection - Fee Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0176 /CH0232 Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB1460) Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0579 (HB1150/CH0204) Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0670 Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0701 Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Materials - Private Detectives Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 (HB1079) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Standards, Requirements, and Application Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page