Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Remote and Hybrid Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 (SB0617/CH0215)
Title
Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807 /CH0333
Title
Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922 (SB0304)
Title
Education - Public Schools - Asian American History Curriculum Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0848)
Title
Garrett County and Allegany County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1424 (SB0782)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 (HB0922)
Title
Education - Public Schools - Asian American History Curriculum Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 /CH0215 (HB0547)
Title
Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717
Title
Public Schools – Virtual Education Days – Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB1424)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1129)
Title
Garrett County and Allegany County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0200 Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 (SB0617/CH0215) Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education) Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0737 Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2022) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0807 /CH0333 Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0922 (SB0304) Education - Public Schools - Asian American History Curriculum Requirement Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
HB1129 (SB0848) Garrett County and Allegany County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Garrett County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
HB1156 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1306 Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1424 (SB0782) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0304 (HB0922) Education - Public Schools - Asian American History Curriculum Requirement Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 /CH0215 (HB0547) Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education) Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 Public Schools – Virtual Education Days – Authorization Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0782 (HB1424) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 (HB1129) Garrett County and Allegany County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/12/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page