Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Rural Areas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392
Title
Financial Institutions - Maryland Community Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 (SB0498)
Title
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Repeal and Mid Shore Health Improvement Coalition Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0263)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0511)
Title
Health and Human Services Transportation Improvement Act of 2023
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Allocation of Grants (Rural Communities Improvement Act of 2023)
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Agriculture – Veterinary Practitioners – Student Loan Forgiveness Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0573)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Extended School Year Innovation Grant
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469
Title
Task Force to Study Solar Tax Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0497)
Title
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Repeal and Mid Shore Health Improvement Coalition Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501
Title
Libraries - Aging Infrastructure Improvement Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 (HB0596)
Title
Health and Human Services Transportation Improvement Act of 2023
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0392 Financial Institutions - Maryland Community Reinvestment Act Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0497 (SB0498) Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Repeal and Mid Shore Health Improvement Coalition Funding Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0525 Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 (SB0263) Maryland Higher Education Commission - Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee - Establishment Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Appropriations
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0596 (SB0511) Health and Human Services Transportation Improvement Act of 2023 Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0695 Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Allocation of Grants (Rural Communities Improvement Act of 2023) Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1133 Agriculture – Veterinary Practitioners – Student Loan Forgiveness Program Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 (HB0573) Maryland Higher Education Commission - Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee - Establishment Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 Primary and Secondary Education - Extended School Year Innovation Grant Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Budget and Taxation
SB0469 Task Force to Study Solar Tax Incentives Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0498 (HB0497) Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Repeal and Mid Shore Health Improvement Coalition Funding Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 Libraries - Aging Infrastructure Improvement Grant Program - Established Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 (HB0596) Health and Human Services Transportation Improvement Act of 2023 Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 10:51 AM
Click to return on the top page