Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cybersecurity (S2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 (SB0107)
Title
State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346
Title
Department of Information Technology - Oversight of Legislative Branch Information Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348
Title
General Assembly and Legislative Branch of State Government - Security Training - Protecting Security-Sensitive Data
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0243 (SB0811)
Title
State Government – Information Technology and Cybersecurity–Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0810)
Title
Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0812/CH0242)
Title
State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0005)
Title
State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0383
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Electronic Stalking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0231
Title
Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 /CH0241 (HB1202)
Title
Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780
Title
Cybersecurity Governance Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 (HB1339)
Title
Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB1205/CH0243)
Title
State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 /CH0242 (HB1346)
Title
State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 (SB0107) State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0346 Department of Information Technology - Oversight of Legislative Branch Information Technology Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 General Assembly and Legislative Branch of State Government - Security Training - Protecting Security-Sensitive Data Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1205 /CH0243 (SB0811) State Government – Information Technology and Cybersecurity–Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0810) Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022) Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0812/CH0242) State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 (HB0005) State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0134 /CH0383 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Electronic Stalking Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0207 /CH0231 Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0754 /CH0241 (HB1202) Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022) Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0780 Cybersecurity Governance Act of 2022 Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0810 (HB1339) Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022) Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0811 (HB1205/CH0243) State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022) Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (115-15)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Appropriations
SB0812 /CH0242 (HB1346) State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page