Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Titles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 /CH0078
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0837)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1129)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0203 /CH0078 Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 (SB0837) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0451 Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles Senator Guzzone 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1129) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page