Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/19/2022 6:50:50 AM
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
Senate
Created: 1/7/2022 4:39 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sens Hester and Guzzone

Interagency Commission on School Construction – Systemic Renovation Projects – Eligibility
Sen Elfreth

Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Sen Waldstreicher

False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
Sen West

Public Safety – Police Athletic League Grant Fund – Establishment
Sen Young

State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Chr B&T (Dept)

Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Chr B&T (Dept)

Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
(Added - 1/10/2022 4:51 PM)
Chr B&T (Dept)

State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Chr B&T (Dept)

Department of Transportation – Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds
Chr B&T (Dept)

Property Tax - Deadline Extension for Homeowners to Redeem Property Involved in a Tax Sale
Chr B&T (Dept)

Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Retroactive Qualification and Calculation of the Credit
Chr B&T (Dept)

State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Property Appraisal Aids and Record Retention (Microfilm to Digital Act of 2022)

Created: 1/11/2022 4:08 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Young

Higher Education – Returned Peace Corps Volunteers – In–State Tuition
Sen Sydnor

Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
Sen Hettleman

Public Schools – Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
Sen Carter

Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation
Sen Hester

Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Libraries – Maryland State Library Board – Membership
Sen Washington

Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
(Removed - 1/13/2022 1:59 PM)

Created: 1/8/2022 2:26 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr FIN (Dept)

Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Chr FIN (Dept)

Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Insurance Administration - Virtual Hearings
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance Carriers - Cybersecurity Standards
Chr FIN (Dept)

Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Fees
(Removed - 1/13/2022 2:49 PM)

Created: 1/5/2022 2:29 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Kagan

Criminal Law - Public Safety - Communications With Public Safety Answering Points
Sen Kagan

Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With a Public Safety Answering Point - Penalties
Sen Kramer

Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Sen Lam

Criminal Law - Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal
Sen Carter

Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
Sen West, et al

Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sen West

Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sen Sydnor

Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sen Bailey

Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Sens Waldstreicher and Carter

Automatic Expungement - Clarification

House
Created: 1/3/2022 3:19 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services on the Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act
Briefing by the State Park Investment Commission on Commission recommendations
Briefing by the Office of Legislative Audits on the State Grants Performance Audit

Created: 1/10/2022 11:18 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Charkoudian, et al

Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Del Charkoudian

Maryland Farms and Families Fund, Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program, and Maryland Farm–to–School Meal Grant Pilot Program – Alterations and Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Ways and Means)
Del Love, et al

Natural Resources – Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Del Love

Agriculture - Right to Engage in Equine Activities
Del Stewart

Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Del Stewart

Environment – Coal Tar Sealant Products – Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Del Lehman

Environment – Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill – Chain of Custody
Del Bagnall

Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice
Del Queen

Local Governments – Urban Agricultural Incentive Zones – Authorization

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 1/17/2022 1:40 PM
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Overview
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/11/2022 1:57 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Total Cost of Care Model

Created: 1/11/2022 1:57 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Johnson

Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners
Del Shetty

Maryland Department of Health – System for Newborn Screening – Requirements
Dels Chang and Krimm

Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues
Dels Hornberger and Reilly

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Cullison

Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
(Removed - 1/12/2022 9:01 AM)

Created: 1/7/2022 3:26 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Hill

Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Del Szeliga

Reckless and Negligent Driving – Death of Another – Must–Appear Violation (Sherry’s and Christopher’s Law)
Del Terrasa

Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Del W. Fisher

Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Dels Cardin and Atterbeary

Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Del Rosenberg

Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation

Created: 12/21/2021 7:54 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
11:15 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates

Created: 1/4/2022 3:59 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Hill

Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment
Del Morgan, et al

Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Del Amprey

State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Del Henson

Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
Del Smith

Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Energy and Property Taxes
Del Palakovich Carr

Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements
Del Crosby

Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Bus Stops
(Removed - 1/7/2022 3:25 PM)

Other
Howard
Created: 1/14/2022 11:26 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Howard County House Delegation and Senate Select Committee No. 5 - Howard County
Meeting Agenda
Howard County Delegation meeting on proposed local bills and bonds.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 1/12/2022 8:44 AM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
The meeting will be live streamed on YouTube
Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
See the Commission webpage for more details.

Click to return on the top page