Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Titles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 /CH0549
Title
Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Lapse of Security - Grace Period
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568 /CH0649 (SB0425/CH0650)
Title
Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons – Compensation – Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0700 (SB0293/CH0701)
Title
Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108
Title
Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471 /CH0197 (SB0978/CH0198)
Title
Garrett County Memorial Hospital – Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170
Title
Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0701 (HB0637/CH0700)
Title
Insurance - Title Insurance Producers - Annual Review
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 /CH0650 (HB0568/CH0649)
Title
Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons - Compensation - Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 /CH0198 (HB1471/CH0197)
Title
Garrett County Memorial Hospital - Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0368 /CH0549 Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Lapse of Security - Grace Period Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 549
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 /CH0649 (SB0425/CH0650) Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons – Compensation – Payment From Title Insurance Producer Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0637 /CH0700 (SB0293/CH0701) Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Economic Matters
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0954 Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1108 Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 /CH0197 (SB0978/CH0198) Garrett County Memorial Hospital – Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0170 Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 /CH0701 (HB0637/CH0700) Insurance - Title Insurance Producers - Annual Review Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0425 /CH0650 (HB0568/CH0649) Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons - Compensation - Payment From Title Insurance Producer Senator Reilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0978 /CH0198 (HB1471/CH0197) Garrett County Memorial Hospital - Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:31 PM
Click to return on the top page