Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Trauma Informed Approach -see also- Mental&Behavioral Health

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0068)
Title
Public Schools - Restorative Practices Schools - Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Pasteur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773 (SB0482)
Title
Public Middle and High Schools - Student Discipline (Right to Teach Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 (HB0197)
Title
Public Schools - Restorative Practices Schools - Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 (HB0773)
Title
Public Middle and High Schools - Student Discipline (Right to Teach Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0770 (HB1105)
Title
Public Schools and Youth Services - Crisis Support and Assistance and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0197 (SB0068) Public Schools - Restorative Practices Schools - Comprehensive Plan Delegate Pasteur 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0773 (SB0482) Public Middle and High Schools - Student Discipline (Right to Teach Act of 2025) Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2025 - 11:00 AM
SB0068 (HB0197) Public Schools - Restorative Practices Schools - Comprehensive Plan Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/29/2025 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0482 (HB0773) Public Middle and High Schools - Student Discipline (Right to Teach Act of 2025) Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 9:30 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2025 - 9:30 AM
SB0770 (HB1105) Public Schools and Youth Services - Crisis Support and Assistance and Workgroup Study Senator Gile 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 2:15 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2025 - 9:30 AM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/4/2025 12:13 PM
Click to return on the top page