Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0031 - Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Special Funds - Prohibited Lease Provisions

Judiciary 2/17/2021 1:30:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/30/2021 1:00:00 PM
As of: 6/12/2024 6:50:22 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Clippinger, Delegate Clippinger FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Davis, Katie Pro Bono Resource Center FWA HB 31 Written Testimony HOUSE.pdf JUD
Jefferson , Stacey Marylanders Against Poverty FAV MAP - HB 31 - MLSC Funding - Support.pdf JUD
Erlichman, Susan Maryland Legal Services Corporation FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
MLSC_HB31_FWA.pdf
JUD
Tompsett, Thomas Harris Jones & Malone FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
LLC, HomeWorks Property Management UNF Court fee bills.pdf JUD
Wiggins, Grason Maryland Multi-Housing Association FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
House Bill 31 - MMHA - Fav W Amendments.pdf
JUD
Howard, Katherine Regional Management, Inc. FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Siri, Michelle The Women's Law Center of Maryland FWA HB 31 - Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Rental JUD
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
MLSC - MCASA - testimony - house - 2021.pdf
JUD
Castelli, William FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
hB 31.pdf
JUD
Francis, Frann Apartment and Office Building Association FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 31--AOBA--FWA.pdf
JUD
Siri, Michelle The Delivery of Legal Services Section Council for the MSBA FWA HB 31 - Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Rental JUD
Conner, Charles Office of the Baltimore County Executive FAV BaltimoreCounty_FAV_HB0031.pdf JUD
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FWA HB31_MNADV_FWA.pdf JUD
Shah, Reena Maryland Access to Justice Commission FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2021.02.15 - A2JC Written Testimony - HB0031 - Cou
JUD
Montgomery, Richard FWA HB 31-Courts-Surcharges_MSBA Suppt w_amd_RMontgome JUD
Hill, Matt FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
Renters United MD_FAV_HB31.pdf
JUD
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-02-17 HB 31 (Support in Concept).pdf JUD
Delegate Clippinger, Delegate Clippinger FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Enten, Robert Maryland Building Industry Assoc UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Conner, Charles Office of the Baltimore County Executive FAV BaltimoreCounty_FAV_HB0031.pdf JPR
Lennig, Dorothy House of Ruth MD FAV HB 31 FAV House of Ruth.pdf JPR
Francis, Frann Apartment and Office Building Association UNF HB 31--AOBA--UNF.pdf JPR
Castelli, William UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
hB 31 2.pdf
JPR
Siri, Michelle The Women's Law Center of Maryland FAV HB 31 - Cross Over - Courts - Surcharges and Payme JPR
Siri, Michelle The Delivery of Legal Services Section Council for the MSBA FAV HB 31 - Cross Over - Courts - Surcharges and Payme JPR
Wiggins, Grason Maryland Multi-Housing Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 31 - MMHA - Opposition - 21.pdf
JPR
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) FWA MLSC - MCASA - testimony - house in senate - 2021. JPR
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FAV HB31_JPR_MNADV_FAV.pdf JPR
Montgomery, Richard FWA HB 31_Surch and Proh Lease Prov_MSBA_FWA_SenJPR_Ma JPR
Hill, Matt FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
Renters United MD_FWA_HB 31 in JPR.pdf
JPR
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FWA 2021-03-30 (Crossover) HB 31 (Support with Amendme JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2021 at 433 PM JPR
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of MD Attorney General FWA 2021-03-30 (Crossover) HB 31 (Support with Amendme JUD
Click to return on the top page