Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0425 - Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact

Health and Government Operations 2/6/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/15/2024 12:59:17 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Rosenberg, Delegate Rosenberg FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Peters, Sarah Husch Blackwell Strategies UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Brocato, Deborah UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
2024 HB425 Opposition.pdf
HGO
Ward, Lindsay MD Chesapeake Chapter of the National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners (NAPNAP) UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
2024 HB425 LOO APRN Compact NAPNAP.docx (2).pdf
HGO
Rosenberg, Samuel House of Delegates FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024_Advanced Practice RN Compact Rosenberg Testim
HGO
Ward, Lindsay National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners Chesapeake Chapter UNF 2024 HB425 LOO APRN Compact LWARD.pdf HGO
Sepulveda, Sabrina Harborside Behavioral Health FAV Testimony HB 425 02.06.2024.pdf HGO
Fishman, Mitzi Maryland Board of Nursing FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 425 - HGO - MBON - LOS.docx.pdf
HGO
Lang, BEVERLY NPAM UNF LOO HB425 BL.pdf HGO
Ware, Kathy UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
OPPOSE_HB 425_ APRN Compact_K_Ware_2024.pdf
HGO
Selway, Janet Nurse Practitioner Association of Maryland UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Nash, Lynn Maryland Military Coalition / Commissioned Officers Association of the U.S. Public Health Services FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
Nash Maryland Military Coalition in support of HB
Nash MMC oral testimony HB 425 February 6 2024.pdf
HGO
Diana, Lorraine FAV revisedSUPPORT HB 425.Lorraine APRN 2024.pdf HGO
Tarleton, Marie Maryland Academy of Advanced Practice Clinicians FAV Support Marie HB425 2024.pdf HGO
Devaris, Shirley FAV APRN Compact Devaris testimony.HGO 2.06.2024 pdf.p HGO
Crain, Elaine FAV HB425 compact testimony EMC.pdf HGO
Crain, Marie FAV HB425 support letters 2024.pdf HGO
Elliott, Robyn FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024 MNA HB 425 House Side.pdf
HGO
Elliott, Robyn FAV 2024 MASBHC HB 425 House Side.pdf HGO
Alborn, Salliann Maryland Community Health System FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024 MCHS HB 425 House Side.pdf
HGO
Russell, Naila UNF Virtual - Oral Testimony
N. Russell Oppose HB 425.pdf
NPAM_Letter_to_NCSBN_re_APR(1).pdf
HGO
Russell, Naila UNF Virtual - Oral Testimony
N. Russell Oppose HB 425.pdf
NPAM_Letter_to_NCSBN_re_APR(1).pdf
HGO
Jafari, Dale Nurse Practitioner Association of Maryland UNF Jafari SIGNED HB425 APRN Compact Oppose 2024.pdf HGO
(MD), State of Maryland FAV 1b - HB 425 - HGO - MACHO - LOS.pdf HGO
State of, Maryland FAV 1a - HB 425 - HGO - MBON - LOS.docx.pdf HGO
Gibbons-Baker, Emalie FAV SUPPORT Emalie HB425 2024.pdf HGO
Baldwin, Elizabeth FAV SUPPORT Compact Beth HB425 2024.pdf HGO
Shew, Ashley American Association of Nurse Practitioners UNF AANP_Testimony_APRN Compact_MD_House_2024.pdf HGO
Cole, Molli Rural Maryland Council FAV HB425_RMC_SupportTestimony.pdf HGO
Martin, Dan Mental Health Association of Maryland FAV HB0425_MHAMD_FAV.pdf HGO
Bode, Claire UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Sherman, Rachel FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 425.pdf
HGO
Bresnahan, Tammy AARP Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 425 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact_
HGO
Livanos, Nicole National Council of State Boards of Nursing FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
NCSBN_APRNCompact_HB 425.pdf
HGO
Shattuck, Daniel Brocato & Shattuck UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
MSA Testimony 2024- Oppose - House Bill 425 - Adva
HGO
Wise, Steve FWA HB0425_FWA_MedChi_Adv. Practice Reg. Nurse Compact HGO
Krienke, Jane Maryland Hospital Association FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 425- Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
HGO
Levine, Brian Montgomery County Chamber of Commerce FAV HB0425 -- Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compa HGO
Duke, Malinda The Nurse Practitioner Association of Maryland (NPAM) UNF NPAM HB 425 letter of opposition 2024.pdf HGO
Dannenfelser, Jill FAV SUPPORT HB425 Jill APRN Compact 2024.pdf HGO
Arnold, Christopher United States Department of Defense-State Liaison Office FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
20240206_MCFP_AM_Support_HB425_APRN-C_v2.pdf
HGO
Stowens, Sarah Christiana Care FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
HGO
Lollo, Nicole NPAM UNF Lollo.HB425.APRN Compact.Oppose.2024.pdf HGO
Towsend, Pegeen Maryland Hospital Association FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Young, Samantha The Chesapeake Bay Affiliate of the National Association of Clinical Nurse Specialists FAV SUPPORTHB425 Sam 2024.pdf HGO
Moss, Pamela MACNS FAV MACNS Support HB 425.pdf HGO
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony HGO
Alternative Dispute Resolution Section, Alternative Dispute Resolution Section Maryland State Bar Association FAV ADRsupport HGO
Click to return on the top page