Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0259 - Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements
Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/5/2025 2:00:00 PM
Ways and Means 3/18/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/21/2025 5:37:59 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm, Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0259 Testimony For 2025-02-05.pdf | EEE | |
Kelter, Chris | Maryland Centers for Independent Living | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Gudger, John Michael | Maryland Association of Election Officials | FAV | Final - SB259 - 2025.docx.pdf | EEE |
DeMarinis, Jared | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SBE Testimony SB259:HB274.pdf |
EEE | |
Mauer, William | FAV | No Testimony | EEE | |
Justice, Gillian | Disability Rights Maryland | FWA | DRM Testimony SB 259 FWA Election Plan Requirement | EEE |
Tyree, Nikki | LWVMD | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB259 Election Law - Local Board of Elections - El |
EEE |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-4-2025 at 1003 AM | EEE | |
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm, Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
Tyree, Nikki | LWVMD | FAV | 3-18 SB259 Election Law - Local Board of Elections | W&M |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0259 Testimony For 2025-03-18.pdf | W&M | |
Justice, Gillian | Disability Rights Maryland | FAV | DRM Testimony FAV SB 259 HOUSE Election Plan Requi | W&M |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools