Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0291 - Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act)
Judicial Proceedings 1/30/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/1/2025 5:55:39 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator Sydnor, Senator Sydnor | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR | |
Barry, Margaret | FAV | SB 291_Barry Support.pdf | JPR | |
Haskins, Deborah | Maryland Council on Problem Gambling | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR |
Moyd, Esquire, Olinda | Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony O. Moyd Testimony - SB 291 - Second Look Act (1).p |
JPR |
Mukherjee, Rianna | FAV | Mukherjee Testimony in Support of Senate Bill 291. | JPR | |
Shellenberger, Scott | Baltimore County State's Attorney's Office | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 291 - Motion to Reduce Duration of Sentence.pd |
JPR |
Tsiongas, Magdalena | FAV | MTsiongasSB291Testimony.pdf | JPR | |
Jordan, Lisae C | Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) | INFO | Sentence reduction - senate testimony - 2025 - SB | JPR |
HAZELTON, MARTINA | FAMILY SUPPORT NETWORK | FAV |
ECI Testimony - 01.28.2025.pdf
ECI Testimony - 01.28.2025v1.pdf JCI Testimony - 01.10.2025.pdf JCI Testimony - 01.22.2025.pdf MCI-J Testimony - 01.22.2025.pdf MCI-W Testimony - 01.28.2025v1.pdf NBCI - 01.31.2024.pdf NBCI - 01.31.2024v1.pdf NBCI - 01.31.2024v2.pdf SB 0291 - SECOND LOOK ACT - FSN - MARTINA HAZELTON |
JPR |
Serpick, Evan | Jews United for Justice | FAV | SB0291_EvanSerpick_JUFJ_FAV_FINAL.pdf | JPR |
Roper, Roberta | UNF | Roberta Roper Testimony SB 291 2005.pdf | JPR | |
Stone, Victor | UNF |
SB291 written testimony2 vs.pdf
SB291 written testimony2 vs.pdf |
JPR | |
Plante, Cecilia | Maryland Legislative Coalition | FAV | SB0291_Maryland_Second_Look_Act_MLC_FAV.pdf | JPR |
Conyers, Joyce | UNF | No Testimony | JPR | |
Proctor, Erica | Maryland Crime Victim Resource Center | UNF | E. Proctor SB-291 Statement.pdf | JPR |
Collins, Dawn | League of Women Voters Calvert County | UNF | No Testimony | JPR |
Gadsby, Whitney | Maryland Crime Victim Resource Center | UNF | Whitney Gadsby SB-291 Testimony 2025.pdf | JPR |
Lichtenberg, Judith | Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform | FAV | second look testimony senate JPR 2025.pdf | JPR |
HAZELTON, MARTINA | FAMILY SUPPORT NETWORK | FAV |
ECI Testimony - 01.28.2025v2.pdf
RCI Testimony - 01.10.2025.pdf SB 0291 - SECOND LOOK ACT - FSN - MARTINA HAZELTON |
JPR |
Lang, Alan | UNF | No Testimony | JPR | |
Vormelker, Will | Maryland Judiciary | UNF | sb291.pdf | JPR |
SWASC, UM | Social Work Advocates for Social Change | FAV | SWASC Testimony SB 291.pdf | JPR |
Phelps Jr, Ken | The Episcopal Diocese of Maryland | FAV | 2025 - SB 0291 - Second Look Act.pdf | JPR |
Varghese, Shaina | FAV | S. Varghese Testimony - SB 0291 - Petition to Redu | JPR | |
Chaudry, Zainab | FAV | SB291.pdf | JPR | |
Morch, Giselle | Marylanders to Prevent Gun Violence | UNF | SB0291 Criminal Procedure-Morch.pdf | JPR |
Kingsley, Joy | Maryland Crime Victims Resource Center, Inc. | UNF | No Testimony | JPR |
Johnson, Dr. Carmen | Helping Ourselves to Transform | FAV | SB291 Second Look Dr. Carmen Johnson - 2025.docx ( | JPR |
shah, sonia | FAV | maryland second look act .pdf | JPR | |
Moore, DaMarqus | Helping Ourselves To Transform | FAV | Dr. Carmen Johnson and Qiana Johnson written testi | JPR |
Harman, Jane | FAV | SB 291 Petition to Reduce Sentence FAV Harman.pdf | JPR | |
Ibeh, Gladys | Maryland Crime Victims Resource Center, Inc. | UNF | No Testimony | JPR |
Geiger, Denise | Maryland Crime Victims Resource Center, Inc. | UNF | SB0291 Criminal Procedure-Geiger.pdf | JPR |
Cichowski, Carol | FAV | 2025 Testimony on SB 291 FAV Cichowski.pdf | JPR | |
Mupanduki, Joanna | Maryland Crime Victims' Resource Center, Inc. | UNF |
Opposition to SB 291.pdf
SB291 MCVRC |
JPR |
Kroll, Steven | Maryland State's Attorneys' Association | UNF | No Testimony | JPR |
Fenwick, Beverly | UNF | Legislation on keeping inmates in Jail.pdf | JPR | |
Wolfgang, Kurt | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony sb 291 testimony.pdf |
JPR | |
Tibbals, Trudy | UNF | No Testimony | JPR | |
Clark, Tiffany | Office of the Attorney General | INFO | 2025_01_30 SB 291 - Support in Concept.pdf | JPR |
Kouadio, Michele | Maryland Alliance for Criminal Justice Reform | FAV | Second Look Testimony Jan 30 2025.pdf | JPR |
Porter, Nicole | The Sentencing Project | FAV | Warren_Allen_The_Sentencing_Project_Support_SB291. | JPR |
Fulton, Angie | Maryland Crime Victims Resource Center, Inc. | UNF | No Testimony | JPR |
Elaine, Arndt | SELF | FAV | No Testimony | JPR |
Mitchell, William | MD Second Look Coalition | FAV | Mitchell_SB291_FAV.pdf | JPR |
Gilbert, Karen | Maryland Crime Victim Resource Center | UNF | Karen Gilbert SB-291 Written Statement .pdf | JPR |
Muhammad, Craig | Second Look Network | FAV | CraigMuhammad_SB291_FAV.pdf | JPR |
Davlin, Sharon | FAV | 2025SB291pdf.pdf | JPR | |
Collins, Rick | UNF | No Testimony | JPR | |
Miller, Brandon | Gibson-Banks Center for Race and the Law | FAV | Gibson-Banks Center Testimony - SB 291.pdf | JPR |
Martz, Michelle | Maryland Criminal Defense Attorneys’ Association (MCDAA) | FAV | MCDAA -Senate Bill 291.pdf | JPR |
Golombek, Daniel | FAV | SB291-FAVORABLE-DAG.pdf | JPR | |
Braveboy, Aisha | Prince George's County State's Attorney | FAV | No Testimony | JPR |
Goodmark, Leigh | University of Maryland School of Law Gender Violence Clinic | FAV | UMD Gender, Prison, and Trauma Clinic SB 291.pdf | JPR |
Blake, Sharon | Restore Maryland | FAV | Maryland Second Look Act SB 291.pdf | JPR |
Bovello, Donald | Maryland Second Look Coalition | FAV | Maryland Second Look Written Testimony 01282025 Bo | JPR |
Saccenti, Brian | Office of the Public Defender | FAV | OPD written testimony in support of SB 291.pdf | JPR |
Spillane, John | FAV | JAS TESTIMONY FAVOR SB291.pdf | JPR | |
Chleboski, Thomas | FAV | Letter in support of SB 291.pdf | JPR | |
Paukstis, Elizabeth | FAV | Testimony in FAVOR_SB 291_Elizabeth Paukstis_Senat | JPR | |
Reece, Brashani | Drop LWOP New England | FAV | Maryland Second Look Support Letter 1.28.25.pdf | JPR |
Bridges, Kam | Job Opportunities Task Force | FAV | Copy of SB 291 - Criminal Procedure - Petition to | JPR |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FAV | Testimony in support of SB0291 - Criminal Procedur | JPR |
Morgan, Troy | INFO | TESTIMONY FOR SB 0291 SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS | JPR | |
Sydnor III, Charles E. | Senator Charles E. Sydnor III | FAV | Senator Charles Sydnor Fav testimony SB291 (Second | JPR |
Jones, Samantha | FAV | Second Look Act.pdf | JPR | |
Muhammad, Anthony | Maryland Parole Partnership / ACLU of Maryland | FAV | Written Testimony - Senate Bill 291.pdf | JPR |
JONES, NATHANIEL | Bridging the Gaps | FAV | SB 0291 Letter of Support Signed.pdf | JPR |
Lao, Serena | FAV | SB291 Testimony- SLao.pdf | JPR | |
Cano, Christopher | SEIU Local 500 | FAV | SEIU Local 500 Testimony in Support of SB 291.pdf | JPR |
Downing, Tricia | MD Second Look Coalition | FAV | SB 291 Second Look Act Testimony.pdf | JPR |
Wise, Isabella | UNF | No Testimony | JPR | |
Roberts, Davon | FAV | Davon Roberts_Prison Inmate in Cumberland Maryland | JPR | |
Carpenter, Crystal | CFSY | FAV | _CFSY Testimony in Support of SB291_Jan302025.pdf | JPR |
Perry, Desmond | RECTIFY | FAV | Maryland Judicial Proceedings Committee.pdf | JPR |
Warnken, Heather | University of Baltimore School of Law Center for Criminal Justice Reform | FAV | CCJR FAV SB 291 Second Look.pdf | JPR |
Braveheart, T. Shekhinah | Justice PoIicy Institute | FAV | No Testimony | JPR |
Melvin, Robert | R Street Institute | FAV | FINAL 2025 MD SB291 Testimony - Robert Melvin.pdf | JPR |
Lawal, Ngozi | FAV | Ngozi Lawal Jan 28 2025 Testimony.pdf | JPR | |
Maryland Equitable Justice Collaborative, MECJ | Maryland Equitable Justice Collaborative | FAV | MEJC Written Testimony Favorable SB291 1-30.pdf | JPR |
Themelis, Nina | Mayor's Office of Government Relations | FAV | SB0291-JPR-SUPP.pdf | JPR |
Dews, Christopher | Cornerstone Government Affairs | FAV | No Testimony | JPR |
Alston, Curtis | F.R.E.S.H | FAV | Honorable Members of the Senate.pdf | JPR |
Amanuel, Yanet | FAV | SB291_FAV_Amanuel .pdf | JPR | |
Quarles, Antoin | Helping Oppressed People Excel (H.O.P.E.) | FAV | No Testimony | JPR |
Selden, Trina | Out for Justice | FAV | No Testimony | JPR |
Fulton, Angela | UNF | SB291 | JPR | |
Collins, Dawn | UNF |
SB291
SB291 Testimony |
JPR | |
Collins, Richard | MCVRC | UNF | SB291 MCVRC | JPR |
Mupanduki, Joanna | MCVRC | UNF | No Testimony | JPR |
Conyers, Joyce | MCVRC | UNF | SB291 MCVRC | JPR |
Agarin, Ufuoma | Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc. | FAV | SB291 Legislative Black Caucus of Md | JPR |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 1-30-2025 at 502 PM | JPR |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools