Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0497 - Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties

Judicial Proceedings 2/17/2021 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 4/1/2021 1:30:00 PM
As of: 7/25/2024 10:10:53 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Kelley, Senator Kelley FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Park, Liz MD Association of Youth Service Bureaus FAV MAYSB - SB 497 FAV - School Board for DJS.pdf JPR
Blomberg, Thomas UNF SB497_Blomberg_Letter to Maryland Senate_2021.pdf JPR
Reusing, Grace FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Senate Bill 497 - Written Testimony and Attachmen
JPR
Lloyd-White, Althea Montgomery County Young Democrats FAV MCYD Testimony - SB497_ Juvenile Services Educatio JPR
Moroney, Nick Maryland Juvenile Justice Monitoring Unit FAV JJMU-OAG Testimony in support of SB 497 (2021).pdf JPR
Abed, Sec. Sam Department of Juvenile Services FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0497 - DJS - Support - Final.pdf
JPR
Kelley, Delores Md. General Assembly FAV SB 497 Kelley Testimony.pdf JPR
Wharton, William Maryland Professional Employees Council (MPEC) FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
Written Testimony from Maryland Professional Emplo
JPR
Dezmon, Barbara Maryland NAACP FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
NAACP Testimony for Senate Bill 497 2-15-21.pdf
JPR
Leone, Peter University of Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB497_Juvenile Services Education Board, Leone, Su
JPR
Sterrette, Dawana FWA SB497 Juvenile Services Board and Program - Establ JPR
Fleming, Rebecca Family and Juvenile Law Section Council FAV SB 497 - Juvenile Services Board and Progam - Esta JPR
Hands, Zachary INFO SB 497 - LOI - Education – Juvenile Services Educa JPR
Woolums, John FAV SB 497.DJS separate school system and procedures.p JPR
O'Day, Garrett MD Catholic Conference FAV MD Catholic Conference_SB 497_FAV.pdf JPR
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony JPR
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-02-17 SB 497 (Support).pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-15-2021 at 452 PM JPR
Senator Kelley, Senator Kelley FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Kelley, Delores Md. General Assembly FAV SB 497 Kelley House JUD WM .pdf JUD
Park, Liz MD Association of Youth Service Bureaus FAV MAYSB - SB 497 FAV - School Board for DJS - House. JUD
Susskind, Danielle MoCo Board of Education FAV SB0497 - MCPS-FAV.pdf JUD
Tress, Andrew Department of Juvenile Services FAV SB0497 - DJS - Support - Final.pdf JUD
Sterrette, Dawana FWA SB497 Juvenile Services Board and Program - Establ JUD
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2021-04-01 (Crossover) SB 497 (Support).pdf JUD
O'Day, Garrett MD Catholic Conference FAV HOUSE CROSS MD Catholic Conference_SB 497_FAV.pdf JUD
Reynolds, Todd FWA DJS bill HB71 SB497 MPEC.pdf JUD
Woolums, John FAV SB 497.DJS separate school system and procedures - JUD
Click to return on the top page