Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0901 - Environment - Packaging and Paper Products - Producer Responsibility Plans
Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/18/2025 1:00:00 PM
Environment and Transportation 3/27/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/24/2025 11:38:16 PM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator Augustine, Senator Augustine | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Southerland, Mark | Safe Skies Maryland | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Patterson, Carol | Foodservice Packaging Institute | INFO | Informational Only_SB 901 EPR_FPI Comments_2025021 | EEE |
Ainsworth, Martha | Maryland Sierra Club | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB901_MDSierraClub_fwa_18Feb2025.pdf |
EEE |
Nolan, Paul | McCormick & Company, Inc. | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE |
Plante, Cecilia | Maryland Legislative Coalition | FAV | SB0901_Packaging_Materials-Producer_Responsibility | EEE |
Blair, Peter | Just Zero | FWA |
Virtual - Oral Testimony Just Zero - FWA Testimony on SB 901.pdf |
EEE |
Doordan, Kelly | Trash Free Maryland | FWA | SB901_FWA_Trash Free Maryland_021825.pdf | EEE |
Cohn, Debbie | FAV | No Testimony | EEE | |
Robinson, Christian | Specialty Equipment Market Association (SEMA) | UNF | SEMA MD SB 901 Oppose.pdf | EEE |
DeFife, Scott | Glass Packaging Institute | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE |
Keeling, David | Pressurized Cylinder Industry Association | INFO | PCIA Packaging EPR Letter - Maryland - Feb 4 2025. | EEE |
Demiray, Sonia | Climate Communications Coalition | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Davlin, Sharon | FAV | No Testimony | EEE | |
Hackman, Andrew | Serlin Haley LLP | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony AMERIPEN - MD SB 901 Senate Education Energy Envir |
EEE |
Miller, Chaz | Maryland Recycling Network | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony MRN25SB901EPRWritten.pdf |
EEE |
Bresee, Christopher | AHRI | UNF |
Virtual - Oral Testimony AHRI Written Testimony MD SB 901 - EPR - 2.18.25.p |
EEE |
Cassel, Scott | Product Stewardship Institute | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025.02.14_PSI_Support_MD_SB901.pdf |
EEE |
Butchko, Dominic | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB0901-EEE_MACo_SWA.pdf |
EEE |
Willman, Frazier | American Forest & Paper Association | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony AF&PA SB 901 Testimony.pdf |
EEE |
Webster, Phil | Legislative body for the Unitarian Universalist faith, C/O Unitarian Universalist Church of Annapolis | FAV | SB 901- Extended Producer Responsibility - Support | EEE |
Kustic, Allison | The Association of Plastic Recyclers | INFO |
Virtual - Oral Testimony MD SB 901_Information_Only_APR letter_FINAL.pdf |
EEE |
Ostdahl, Maggie | National Aquarium | FWA | SB 901 - National Aquarium - Support with amendmen | EEE |
Price, Sarah | Maryland Retailers Alliance | INFO |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE |
Arndt, Dave | FAV | No Testimony | EEE | |
Brice, Tyler | Maryland Municipal League | FAV | 2025-MML-SB901-Favorable.pdf | EEE |
Smith, Virginia | Indivisible HoCo Maryland | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Vetter, Drew | INFO | SB0901_LOI_NWRA_Env. - Packaging Materials - Produ | EEE | |
Krone, Christine | INFO | SB0901_LOI_ACA_Environment - Packaging Materials - | EEE | |
Allen, Hannah | Maryland Chamber of Commerce | UNF | SB 901_Environment - Packaging Materials - Produce | EEE |
McNair, Lee | Unitarian Universalist Environmental Justice Ministry | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Lefebvre, David | Circular Action Alliance | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony MD Public Hearing SB 901 - Feb 18 2025.pdf |
EEE |
Sublett, Jenna | FWA | Testimony on SB 901 2025.pdf | EEE | |
Truelove, Alex | Biodegradable Products Institute | FWA |
Virtual - Oral Testimony Maryland SB 901 EPR 2025 written testimony_BPI.pdf |
EEE |
Harvey, Tiffany | Cornerstone Government Affairs | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE |
Taylor, Tom | FAV | Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility Plan | EEE | |
Thompson, Melvin | Restaurant Association of Maryland | INFO | SB901_RestaurantAssoc_Thompson_INFO.pdf | EEE |
Baker, Jeremy D | Maryland Department of the Environment | FWA | MDE SB901 SWA (1).pdf | EEE |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-25-2025 at 922 AM | EEE | |
Senator Augustine, Senator Augustine | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
ENT | |
McLuckie, John | Consumer Healthcare Products Association | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
ENT |
Richard, John | Flexible Packaging Association | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025MDSB901Support.pdf |
ENT |
Lang, Alan | UNF | No Testimony | ENT | |
Blair, Peter | Just Zero | FWA |
Virtual - Oral Testimony Just Zero - Testimony on SB 901 (03.27.2025).pdf SB901_Blair_UNF |
ENT |
Plante, Cecilia | Maryland Legislative Coalition | FAV | SB0901_Packaging_Materials-Producer_Responsibility | ENT |
Ranson, Emily | FAV | SB901_FAV_CleanWaterAction_EmilyRanson.pdf | ENT | |
Webster, Phil | Legislative body for the Unitarian Universalist faith, C/O Unitarian Universalist Church of Annapolis | FAV | SB 901 - House Hearing -Extended Producer Responsi | ENT |
Harvey, Tiffany | Cornerstone Government Affairs | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony House Testimony on SB 901 2025.pdf |
ENT |
Brown, Townsend | ELF - EPR Leadership Forum | INFO | ELF Letter_MD_901.docx (1) (1).pdf | ENT |
Hackman, Andrew | Serlin Haley LLP | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony AMERIPEN - MD SB 901 House E & T Comm Mar. 2025.pd |
ENT |
Price, Sarah | Maryland Retailers Alliance | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
ENT |
Tosi, Jeff | Maryland Environmental Service | FAV | SB 901 HOUSE E&T MES Support.pdf | ENT |
Patterson, Carol | Foodservice Packaging Institute | FWA | SB 901_Environment and Transportation Committee_FP | ENT |
Lefebvre, David | Circular Action Alliance | FWA |
Virtual - Oral Testimony |
ENT |
Butchko, Dominic | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FAV | SB0901-ET_MACo_SUP.pdf | ENT |
Kustic, Allison | The Association of Plastic Recyclers | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB901_Kustic_APR_FWA |
ENT |
Buka, Stephanie | PRINTING United Alliance | UNF | MD_Oppose SB 901_GJ_SO_3.25.25.pdf | ENT |
Turnock, Kierstin | FAV | EMN Testimony_SB 901_Support.pdf | ENT | |
Krone, Christine | INFO | SB0901 - House_LOI_ACA_Environment - Packaging Mat | ENT | |
DeFife, Scott | Glass Packaging Institute | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
ENT |
Vetter, Drew | INFO | SB0901 - House_LOI_NWRA_Env. - Packaging Materials | ENT | |
Feighner, Liz | HoCo Climate Action | FAV | No Testimony | ENT |
Feighner, Liz | Less Plastic Please | FAV | No Testimony | ENT |
Willman, Frazier | American Forest & Paper Association | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony HOUSE E&T AF&PA SB 901 Testimony.pdf |
ENT |
Felz, Drew | McCormick & Company | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
ENT |
Taylor, Tom | FAV | SB901 - Environment - Packaging Materials - Produc | ENT | |
Thompson, Melvin | Restaurant Association of Maryland | INFO | SB901_ENT_RestaurantAssoc_Thompson_INFO.pdf | ENT |
Baker, Jeremy D | Maryland Department of the Environment | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB901_FWA_MDE UPDATED |
ENT |
Doordan, Kelly | Trash Free Maryland | FWA | SB901_FWA_TrashFreeMaryland_ENT_032725.pdf | ENT |
Ainsworth, Martha | Maryland Sierra Club | FWA | SB901_Ainsworth_FWA_Final | ENT |
Truelove, Alex | Biodegradable Products Institute | FWA |
Virtual - Oral Testimony Maryland SB901 EPR_BPI house environment comments. |
ENT |
Allen, Hannah | Maryland Chamber of Commerce | INFO | SB 901_Environment - Packaging and Paper Products | ENT |
Ostdahl, Maggie | National Aquarium | FWA | SB 901 - National Aquarium - Support with amendmen | ENT |
Costa, Greg | INFO |
Virtual - Oral Testimony |
ENT | |
Cassady, Jacob | Association of Home Appliance Manufacturers | FWA | SB901_FWA_AHAM | ENT |
Blair, Peter | Just Zero and Beyond Plastics | UNF | No Testimony | ENT |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools