Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0974 - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund Fees

Budget and Taxation 2/28/2024 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/27/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 6/19/2024 7:00:27 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Guzzone, Senator Guzzone FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
B&T
StGerard, Henriot FAV 2.28.24_Henriot St.Gerard Testimony for SB 974.pdf B&T
Serkin, Celia Montgomery County Federation of Families for Children's Mental Health, Inc. FAV MC Federation of Families Testimony 2024 SB 974- 9 B&T
Rosier, Collan Pyramid Healthcare, Inc. FAV 2024-02-28 - MD - Pyramid Healthcare - Testimony r B&T
Witten, Jennifer LifeBridge Health FAV 2024 SB974 LifeBridge Health Testimony.Jennifer Wi B&T
Lapp, David Office of People's Counsel FWA SB0974 OPC Testimony.pdf B&T
Geddes, Ann Mental Health Association of Maryland FAV SB0974_MHAMD_Fav.pdf B&T
Loeffler, Derek Baltimore Police Department FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
B&T
Shi, Tesia FAV 2024_SB 974_988 Trust Fund Fees_FAVORABLE (1).pdf B&T
Kurlys-Rossoll, Algina Holy Cross Health Network FAV Nexus Montgomery SB974.pdf B&T
Highsmith Vernick, Nikki The Horizon Foundation FAV SB 974_Horizon Foundation_fav.pdf B&T
Richard, Nicholas Baltimore Crisis Response, Inc. FAV BCRI SB 974 Support Testimony Final.pdf B&T
Tauler, Ashley Maryland Coalition of Families FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MCF-SB 974 Testimony-FAV.pdf
B&T
Maskaleris, Sue FAV 2024_SB 974_988 Trust Fund Fees_FAVORABLE__AFSP.pd B&T
Rosen-Cohen, Nancy NCADD-Maryland FAV NCADD-MD - 2024 SB 974 FAV - 988 Funding - Senate. B&T
Martin, Lyla FAV MARTIN_MCHI_FAV_SB 974.docx.pdf B&T
Aleshire, Shannon FAV Support SB 974 Behavioral Health Crisis Response S B&T
Maxwell, Cheryl Black Mental Health Alliance FAV BMHA Hearing Testimony SB974 Feb 28 2024.pdf B&T
Caplan, Jason FAV SB 974 - B&T - MDH- LOS.pdf B&T
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony B&T
Meiser, Henry J. Student Commissioner - Governor's Commission on Suicide Prevention FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
SB 974 - Favorable (1).pdf
B&T
Bogdan, Henry Maryland Nonprofits FAV SB 974 - SUPP to B&T - 988 Funding - Feb 28.pdf B&T
Ortiz, Jeanette Johns Hopkins University and Medicine FAV SB974 988 Fee - JH Support 2.28.24.pdf B&T
Towsend, Pegeen Maryland Hospital Association FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 974.pdf
B&T
Jansen, Timothy Community Crisis Services FAV SB 974_988 Trust Fund Fees_Testimony.pdf B&T
Taylor, Allison Kaiser Permanente FAV SB 974_988 telecom fee_Support.pdf B&T
Mills, Morgan Compass Government Relations FAV SB974 FAV.pdf B&T
Sanders, Alyssa EveryMind. FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EveryMind SB974 Testimony.pdf
B&T
Mackall, Carlos FAV SB 974 Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services B&T
Harris, Mrs. FAV No Testimony B&T
Krone, Christine FAV SB0974_FAV_GWSCSW_BH Crisis Response Serv. - 9-8-8 B&T
Rabbitt, Dan Behavioral Health System Baltimore FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 974_988 Telecom Fee_FAVORABLE.pdf
B&T
Woolard, Ashley Public Justice Center FAV SB 974_PJC_Favorable_BT.pdf B&T
Kauffman, Danna FAV SB0974_FAV_MDACEP_BH Crisis Response Serv. - 9-8- B&T
Nash, Lynn Maryland Military Coalition / Commissioned Officers Association of the U.S. Public Health Services FAV 2021-State-Data-Sheet-Maryland-508-1.pdf
Nash MMC written testimony_SB 974_ 9-8-8 Trust Fun
B&T
Manning, Jamie Life Crisis Center, Inc. FAV LCC Testimony SB974.pdf B&T
Schumitz, Kali Maryland Center on Economic Policy FAV SB 974_MD Center on Economic Policy_FAV.pdf B&T
Kabara, Ilona FAV SB974_Favorable_MdPHA.pdf B&T
Martinez, Madelin Catholic Charities FAV SB0974_CC_Martinez_FAV.pdf B&T
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-28-2024 at 110 PM B&T
Senator Guzzone, Senator Guzzone FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Rosen-Cohen, Nancy NCADD-Maryland FAV NCADD-MD - 2024 SB 974 FAV - 988 Funding - House.p HGO
Bogdan, Henry Maryland Nonprofits FAV No Testimony HGO
Mills, Morgan Compass Government Relations FAV SB974 FAV HGO.pdf HGO
Kimball, Angela Inseparable FAV MD_SB974_Inseparable Testimony_2024 03 27.pdf HGO
Rabbitt, Dan Behavioral Health System Baltimore FAV SB 974_988 Telecom Fee_CROSSOVER_FAVORABLE.pdf HGO
Caplan, Jason FAV 15 - SB 974 - HGO- BHA - LOS.pdf HGO
Senator Guzzone, Senator Guzzone FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Click to return on the top page